Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Christine Immel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Sallah, Dean Jason, against William Immel, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Valerie M Cartright presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValerie M Cartright Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 17, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 23, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
May 20, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - 11 | ||
May 06, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - 10 | ||
May 06, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - 9 | ||
May 06, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - 8 | ||
May 06, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #007) | ||
May 06, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #007) | ||
May 03, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.