Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
David Carey, Mapfre Insurance Company A S O, Paige M Morris, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Sabella, Vince Anthony, against 7 Sagaponack Court Llc, G. Konner Construction Corp, Hailiang America Corp, Konner Development Corporation, Morano Plumbing Inc, (total of 8) See All represented by Dooley, Christopher Paul, Gionis, John H., Heffernan, Dennis S, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas Whelan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Whelan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Property Damage) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: September 07, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
February 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Morano Plumbing deposition transcript Morano Plumbing deposition transcript Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
February 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Deposition of Gregory Konner |
||
February 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Plaintiff's deposition transcript |
||
February 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #006) Blackman Plumbing Notice of Motion |
||
February 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #006) Morano PO |
||
February 17, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #006) Counter-Statement of Material Facts Pursuant to Rule 202.8-g |
||
February 17, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 10, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. Thomas F. Whelan |
||
February 09, 2023 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.