Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, Robert Gitchell Jr A K A Robert Gitchell, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick F Mcallister presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick F Mcallister Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 04, 2023ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE
Date: July 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: January 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE status |
||
July 12, 2023 |
ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE Transferring Case to Master Calendar |
||
June 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SC 7/12/23 AOS by Mail and Notifying Letter |
||
March 17, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 17, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
March 17, 2023 | Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons | ||
March 16, 2023 | Affidavit of Service by Mail | ||
March 16, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
March 16, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
February 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT GITCHELL JR AKA ROBERT GITCHELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.