Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Ashley Kalish Individually And As Administrator And Representative Of The Estate Of Nicholas J. Elward, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Schlather, Raymond Martin, against Northern Asphalt, Llc, Robert D Qualtrough, represented by Bucci, Connor James, Otto, Susan Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: July 12, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: January 17, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: January 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
April 21, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
April 20, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
February 14, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS |
||
February 13, 2023 | Answer | ||
February 10, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 31, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 17, 2023 | COMPLAINT | ||
January 17, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT LETTER RE. RJI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.