Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Timebuyer, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Swartz, Eric Thomas, against Emilee Fronk, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 11, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 23, 2023DEFECT CHECKLIST
Date: June 23, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - a
Date: May 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 10, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
June 23, 2023 | DEFECT CHECKLIST | ||
June 21, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 24, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
May 24, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a exhibit for aff of non mil service |
||
February 23, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 23, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 11, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.