Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Rocket Mortgage, Llc Fka Quicken Loans, Llc Fka Quicken Loans Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against Heather Bennett, John Doe, Logan Baer, Mary Doe, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Craig J Doran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig J Doran Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 04, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 04, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 20, 2023 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
August 09, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Letter to Borrower including Default Judgment Link and hearing date |
||
August 09, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 01, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 01, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 13, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) Notice of Motion return date and Link |
||
July 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 07, 2023 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.