Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Laura L Sortore, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Betzjitomir, Susan Marie, against Michael A Sortore, represented by Charlap, Allan G., in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with James Vazzana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Vazzana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2023 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
December 12, 2022 | ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | ||
November 29, 2022 | PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISPOSITION | ||
September 14, 2022 | DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISPOSITION | ||
September 14, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
September 12, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
August 05, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 29, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 29, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) (POST RJI) | ||
May 11, 2022 | PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.