Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fareverse Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bhatia, Raspreet, Wynn, Adam Seth, against Robert L Est Smith, Secretary Housing & Urban Development, States America United, represented by Mullen, Aaron Isaiah, Roach, Mary Keefe, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick F Mcallister presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick F Mcallister Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
September 15, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
September 15, 2022 | TERMS OF SALE | ||
September 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | ||
August 22, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
August 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 24, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
March 07, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 07, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.