Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Terri Fullerton, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Misula, Roman Arthur, against American Baptist Churches Nys, Baptist Church Corning First, Jack Spaulding, Northeast Fellowship Independent Baptist Churches, represented by Ferratella, James P, Rotenberg, Roy Z., Smith, Sheldon Keith, Staszkiw, Michael Richard, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Deborah Chimes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah Chimes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a Child Victims Act proceeding filed by Terri Fullerton against the First Baptist Church of Corning, NY, Northeast Fellowship of Independent Baptist Churches, and Jack Spaulding. The complaint alleges sexual abuse by Jack Spaulding,...
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 08, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: November 17, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 08, 2021ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 16, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2021SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: May 27, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: May 27, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 16, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 27, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 05, 2021ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 22, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 11, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2021SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: February 22, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2021PETITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 16, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 17, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
November 09, 2021 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD CHIMES (Hearing) Judge: HON DEBORAH A CHIMES |
|
November 08, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Proposed Scheduling Order |
||
October 18, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #1) | ||
October 13, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Attorney Certificate of Good Standing |
||
September 16, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 16, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.