Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Cynthia A Mcconnell, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: January 27, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: January 27, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 27, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 27, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: February 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 03, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
January 27, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
January 27, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
||
January 27, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
January 27, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 12, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.