Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
River Flats Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Mc Namara, Mark Ryan, Prossick, Jennifer K., against Corning Town Board Assessment Review, Town Assessor Corning, represented by Ryan, John Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with GAIL DONOFRIO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGAIL DONOFRIO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 20, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 19, 2020NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: July 20, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 06, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 03, 2020PETITION
Date: July 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of NOA of Nicholas C. Roberts, Esq. for Corning-Painted Post CSD |
||
August 19, 2020 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance of Nicholas C. Roberts, Esq. for Corning-Painted Post Central School District |
||
August 19, 2020 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance of Nicholas C. Roberts, Esq. for Intervenor-Respondent, Corning-Painted Post Ce Notice of Appearance of Nicholas C. Roberts, Esq. for Intervenor-Respondent, Corning-Painted Post Ce ... show more |
||
August 06, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
August 03, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Personal Service |
||
August 03, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
July 20, 2020 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
July 20, 2020 | NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) | ||
July 20, 2020 | PETITION | ||
July 20, 2020 | Motion |
TAX ASSESSMENT REVIEW (Motion #001) Before Justice: HON. GAIL DONOFRIO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. GAIL DONOFRIO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.