Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Credit Corp Solutions Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Nicole Masti, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 30, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 18, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 14, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 30, 2020AFFIRMATION *Corrected*
Date: November 14, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: December 02, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 18, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A exhibit A |
||
November 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B DEF LTR |
||
November 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Stip_AFM |
||
November 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION *Corrected* Non-Mil |
||
September 20, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 20, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 02, 2020 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Matter#372195 |
||
September 30, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.