Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
William Kohlmeier, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Czarples, Anna Christina, against Arnot Health Inc, Arnot Medical Services Pllc, Ira Davenport Memorial Hospital, Nadine Bocek, represented by Callocchia, Tomas James, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick F Mcallister presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick F Mcallister Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: January 12, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: January 12, 2021ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: December 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 16, 2021 | ORDER - MEDIATION | ||
December 09, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
November 04, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT Letter requesting conference |
||
August 17, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
April 30, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
April 29, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge McAllister |
||
April 29, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Scheduling Order |
||
January 29, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
January 28, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Scheduling Order (Proposed) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.