Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bridget A Calkins, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kerry L Calkins, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
August 27, 2021 | SWORN STATEMENT OF REMOVAL OF BARRIERS TO REMARRIAGE | ||
August 27, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
August 25, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
August 25, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
July 01, 2019 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
June 26, 2019 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
May 08, 2019 | NOTICE | ||
May 08, 2019 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
May 08, 2019 | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.