Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other case in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with JOHN B GALLAGHER JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN B GALLAGHER JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2018 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time1254 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) PIAMPIANO (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES J. PIAMPIANO |
|
August 22, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED GALLAGHER JR (Court Activity) Judge: JOHN B GALLAGHER JR |
|
August 07, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #003) PIAMPIANO (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES J. PIAMPIANO |
|
August 07, 2018 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD PIAMPIANO (Hearing) Judge: JAMES J. PIAMPIANO |
|
July 02, 2018 | Motion |
REARGUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #003) Decided: 08/22/2018RESERVED DENIED Before Justice: JOHN B GALLAGHER JR Answer demanded: No Judge: JOHN B GALLAGHER JR |
|
July 02, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #003) GALLAGHER JR (Motion Part) Judge: JOHN B GALLAGHER JR |
|
May 21, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) PIAMPIANO (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES J. PIAMPIANO |
|
May 01, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) PIAMPIANO (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES J. PIAMPIANO |
|
May 01, 2018 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD PIAMPIANO (Hearing) Judge: JAMES J. PIAMPIANO |
|
March 19, 2018 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD BRADSTREET (Hearing) Judge: HON PETER C BRADSTREET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.