Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
David R Whitlock, Jonathan B Whitlock, Martha W Kolios, Peter C Whitlock, Stephen E Whitlock Deceased, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Late Notice Of Claim) case represented by Wells, John Mark, against Barry A Schnoll, Beth E Moskow, Cayuga Excavating Inc, Romulus Town Of, represented by Crossmore, Edward Y., Duggan, Matthew John, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2017 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Late Notice Of Claim) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
|
ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: April 28, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 28, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
May 18, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
February 08, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 08, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 20, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3) Letter to Judge requesting decision on motion |
||
November 23, 2021 |
NOTICE Conference Notice |
||
November 18, 2021 | ORDER - RECUSAL | ||
October 11, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Exhibit A/Affidavit of Peter Whitlock |
||
October 11, 2021 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.