Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Om-Other case in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts with Bender, Hon. Dennis F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBender, Hon. Dennis F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2017 |
CategoryOm-Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time139 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided Bender (Court Activity) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
November 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Bender (Hearing) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
November 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
November 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
November 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Bender (Hearing) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
November 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
September 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
September 23, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 11/29/2016Decided Before Justice: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.