Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts with Bender, Hon. Dennis F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBender, Hon. Dennis F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time62 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Venue Change Bender (Court Activity) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
October 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
October 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Bender (Hearing) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
October 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
October 11, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Bender (Hearing) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
October 11, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
August 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
August 26, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 10/27/2016Decided Before Justice: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.