Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Michael D Calarco, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Grow, John Lindsay, against Kathleen A Calarco, represented by Petronio, Arthur Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts with Barry L Porsch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry L Porsch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
January 11, 2022 | SEPARATION AGREEMENT - MODIFIED | ||
October 18, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO CLERK | ||
October 18, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
October 12, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
October 05, 2021 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
October 05, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 05, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 05, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
October 05, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.