Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Clark Smith, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2022NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE |
||
January 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 22, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
December 22, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
December 22, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
December 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
December 22, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
December 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
December 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
October 20, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.