Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Auburn Community Hospital, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Levine, Louis, against Sarah L. Blackburn, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
July 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 17, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Proposed judgment |
||
June 17, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Non.military AOS |
||
June 17, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT 3215 AOS |
||
June 17, 2021 | Affidavit of facts | ||
June 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Military search |
||
April 05, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 22, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.