Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Schuyler Hospital Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hammond, Chad Richard, against Scott Simone, in the jurisdiction of Schuyler County. This case was filed in Schuyler County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSchuyler County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 22, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: March 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
March 15, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AND ENTRY THEREOF |
||
March 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 11, 2021 |
BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted |
||
February 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted |
||
February 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION | ||
February 08, 2021 |
ADMISSION OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
||
January 22, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT VERIFIED |
||
January 22, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.