Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Schuyler Hospital Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hammond, Chad Richard, against Nicholas Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Schuyler County. This case was filed in Schuyler County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSchuyler County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
||
February 10, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AND ENTRY THEREOF |
||
February 09, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 08, 2021 |
BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted |
||
December 22, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 22, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted |
||
December 22, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE | ||
December 22, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
December 11, 2020 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT VERIFIED |
||
December 11, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.