Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wilmington Trust National Association, As Successor Trustee To Citibank, N.A., As Trustee For Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Trust 2005-Cl1, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-Cl1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., against Clerk Of Schuyler County, Dawn M. Wheeler A K A Dawn Wheeler, John Doe Et Al., New York State Affordable Housing Corporation, William J. Wheeler, (total of 5) See All represented by Benedict, Alan Steven, , in the jurisdiction of Schuyler County. This case was filed in Schuyler County Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSchuyler County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 20, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 09, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2020FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: June 03, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 17, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 09, 2020ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2020FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: October 19, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 25, 2022ANSWER
Date: June 17, 2022NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 26, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: July 08, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: September 12, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: November 28, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 10, 2023FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: January 26, 2023FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: February 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
January 26, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
January 10, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Daniel J. Fitzsimmons, Esq. |
||
November 28, 2022 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
October 19, 2022 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
September 12, 2022 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
July 08, 2022 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
June 17, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 17, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
June 03, 2022 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.