Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Guthrie Robert Packer Hospital, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hammond, Chad Richard, against Carleen Lattin, in the jurisdiction of Schuyler County. This case was filed in Schuyler County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions91 days |
Filing LocationSchuyler County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 17, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: December 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 18, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 17, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 14, 2020 |
BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST FOR JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED INTEREST FOR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
October 06, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted |
||
October 06, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE | ||
October 06, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
October 06, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 17, 2020 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT VERIFIED |
||
September 17, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.