Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Schuyler Hospital Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hammond, Chad Richard, against Christopher Hall, in the jurisdiction of Schuyler County. This case was filed in Schuyler County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationSchuyler County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: December 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 21, 2020BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST FOR JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 23, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
December 23, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 18, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 17, 2020 |
BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST FOR JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED INTEREST FOR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
September 22, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 21, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
September 21, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION | ||
September 21, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted |
||
September 11, 2020 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT VERIFIED |
||
September 11, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED BILLS Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.