Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Carroll E Cervoni, in the jurisdiction of Schuyler County. This case was filed in Schuyler County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSchuyler County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 24, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 13, 2020STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: April 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
August 24, 2020 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
August 14, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 14, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 13, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
July 24, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.