Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Erie Insurance Company A S O Lake Town & Country Septic, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gorman, Colin James, Stern, Robert Ashley, against William H. Barnett, represented by Savage, Joseph William, in the jurisdiction of Schuyler County. This case was filed in Schuyler County Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSchuyler County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 05, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE with Final Order |
||
March 08, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
March 05, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 02, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE WITH ORDER |
||
March 02, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
March 01, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #1) Exhibit A - Email correspondence / Exhibit B - Lien notice |
||
February 26, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 26, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
February 22, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Release |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.