Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Schuyler County, NY, . Schuyler County, NY Superior Courts with Dennis J. Morris presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Morris Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationSchuyler County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time182 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) MORRIS (Motion Part) Judge: HONORABLE DENNIS J. MORRIS |
|
October 05, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MORRIS (Motion Part) Judge: HONORABLE DENNIS J. MORRIS |
|
October 05, 2018 | Hearing |
MORRIS (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HONORABLE DENNIS J. MORRIS |
|
September 24, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MORRIS (Motion Part) Judge: HONORABLE DENNIS J. MORRIS |
|
August 03, 2018 | Hearing |
MORRIS (Settlement Conference) Held Judge: HONORABLE DENNIS J. MORRIS |
|
June 01, 2018 | Hearing |
MORRIS (Settlement Conference) Held Judge: HONORABLE DENNIS J. MORRIS |
|
April 06, 2018 | Hearing |
MORRIS (Settlement Conference) Held Judge: HONORABLE DENNIS J. MORRIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.