Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Danielle M. Greene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Allen, Kimberly B., against Kyle D. Greene, represented by Waters, Erica Kay, Hunt, Lauren Lisa, in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County, NY, . Schenectady County, NY Superior Courts with Kevin A Burke presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin A Burke Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
November 07, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
November 07, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
July 19, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 16, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
June 16, 2022 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
June 06, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
May 16, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL | ||
May 12, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL (PROPOSED) | ||
May 11, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.