Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fourtner, Tracy Mckay, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Heaney, Alexandra Rose, Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie, Polowy, Amy E., (total of 7) See All against Capital One Bank, Corissa Casso, John Doe, Michael G. Sage, United States Of America Acting Through The Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 5) See All represented by Spina, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County, NY, . Schenectady County, NY Superior Courts with Mark L Powers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark L Powers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT Non Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 15, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT *Corrected*
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2021BILL OF COSTS
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 16, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 15, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2023NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: January 23, 2023JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 23, 2023 | NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION | ||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Schedule A - Legal Description |
||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Schedule B - Amended COVID-19 Policies |
||
January 17, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
December 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
||
December 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due |
||
December 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Certificate of Merit |
||
December 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service of the Summons, per CPLR 3215(g)(3)(iii) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.