Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Dawn Gilligan, in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County, NY, . Schenectady County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
November 09, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
November 03, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 21, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 21, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 14, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q64702922015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.