Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Michael J Conover, in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County, NY, . Schenectady County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE BY MAILING |
||
June 08, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 25, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 24, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
April 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 02, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
April 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
||
April 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
April 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.