Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
C.S. As Parent And Natural Guardian Of C.S. An Infant, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Finn, Ryan Michael, against Philip Lord, represented by Cometti, Mario David, in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County, NY, . Schenectady County, NY Superior Courts with Michael Cuevas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael Cuevas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Emotional Distress) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 03, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 14, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Subpoena Attachment A |
||
August 08, 2022 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
August 04, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 04, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
August 01, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Conference Order |
||
July 07, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 01, 2022 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST | ||
March 09, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.