Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Vanessa Burgos, in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County, NY, . Schenectady County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
November 05, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 04, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
September 20, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
September 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
September 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
September 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
September 20, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
September 20, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER Redacted |
||
September 20, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.