Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, against Robert Rock, in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County, NY, . Schenectady County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 02, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: June 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 28, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 28, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
November 12, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
November 12, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
November 12, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
November 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
November 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
November 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
November 12, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.