Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Clarence J. Beames Iv, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kim, Ronald Joseph, against Phoenix Environmental Laboratories, Inc., represented by Noonan, Allegra Ausilia, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with James E Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 06, 2021AFFIRMATION (AFFIDAVIT) OF REGULARITY
Date: January 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
March 17, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 17, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 17, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
March 17, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
March 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (AFFIDAVIT) OF REGULARITY Statements |
||
January 04, 2022 |
RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION Affidavit of Service |
||
January 04, 2022 |
MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) Affidavit of Compliance |
||
January 04, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.