Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Jamie Gentili, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mikullitz, Kelly Jeanne, against Francis Mark Gentili, represented by Place, Rose Theresa, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with James E Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJune 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2023 | TRIAL DOCUMENTS | ||
June 09, 2023 | TRIAL - WITNESS LIST | ||
May 31, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
May 31, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - B | ||
May 31, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - A | ||
May 30, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 30, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
May 16, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 02, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
May 02, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.