Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ellis Hospital, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Rachel Woo, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with Dianne N Freestone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDianne N Freestone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 14, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 18, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 09, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1) Itemized statements and consent forms Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 01, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 18, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 18, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 09, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 14, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 13, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 09, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter Withdrawing Notice of Motion |
||
December 09, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Confession of Judgment |
||
November 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Defendant's Answer |
||
November 18, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons, verified complaint and affidavit of service Redacted per 22 NYCRR Summons, verified complaint and affidavit of service Redacted |
||
November 18, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.