Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jennifer M Sitors, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Shartrand, Jo Ann, against Kyle J Sitors, represented by Coughtry, Joann Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with Vincent W. Versaci presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent W. Versaci Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
February 13, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 22, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
February 18, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
February 17, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
February 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
February 08, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
February 08, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
February 08, 2021 | UCS - 111 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.