Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Second Round Sub, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Digiaro, Michael, Garbus, Mark A, Gunther, Tess E, against Donald Olson, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with Richard A Kupferman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard A Kupferman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 02, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 08, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 01, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 30, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 01, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 06, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: November 06, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 01, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 08, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 01, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: July 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION |
||
November 06, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION DISCONTINUING ACTION |
||
November 06, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) SETTLEMENT STIPULATION |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
September 15, 2023 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY NOTE OF ISSUE |
||
September 02, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 02, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
September 01, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
September 01, 2022 | Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.