Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dolores Cortellessa Individually And As Executor Of The Estate Of Eugene Cortellessa, Dolores Cortellessa Individually And As Executor Of The Estate Of Eugene Cortellessa, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Laraby, Daniel Paul, Porter, Michael Scott, against Abc Entities 1 Through 5, Kenneth Schwartz M.D., St. Peter'S Health Partners, St. Peter'S Health Partners Medical Associates, P.C., represented by Mcfarland, Mandy, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with Richard A Kupferman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard A Kupferman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
February 27, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 07, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
December 06, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
November 02, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
October 25, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 15, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
August 30, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 25, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.