Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Second Round Sub Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Leigh K Blanche, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: February 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A INVOICE |
||
February 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT AFF OF FACTS |
||
February 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER |
||
February 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT BUYER |
||
February 28, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT. |
||
February 28, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 07, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
January 21, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
January 18, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) SCRA/Non-Military Affidavit |
||
February 11, 2021 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION MILITARY SEARCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.