Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Crown Asset Management Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Cynthia R Diaz, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with Vincent W. Versaci presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent W. Versaci Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 20, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
May 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
May 25, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 25, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
May 23, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
May 18, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
May 17, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) MILITARY |
||
May 02, 2022 |
DEFECT CHECKLIST SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
April 28, 2022 |
DEFECT CHECKLIST SUPPLEMENTAL ATTORNEY AFFIRMAION |
||
April 27, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) TMP#392618 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.