Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Tremaroli, Robert Steven, against Balgobin Ramkissoon, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with James E Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 02, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 27, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 02, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 16, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 02, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: January 13, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 31, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 27, 2022NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE
Date: February 08, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: January 13, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 30, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 07, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 27, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 02, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 07, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 07, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 27, 2019NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: January 03, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) | ||
January 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 03, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 31, 2022 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY 2nd LP |
||
May 02, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION W/EXHIBITS |
||
May 02, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL MAILING |
||
May 02, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
May 02, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
||
May 02, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY |
||
April 27, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Order of Reference and Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.