Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brennan, Jennifer R., Chen, Shu, Perciballi, Nicholas Emilio, against Edward R Henry, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with James E Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 31, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2022 |
FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM Surplus Monies form |
||
December 22, 2022 | Referee Report of Sale | ||
October 05, 2022 | Notice of Sale and Affidavit of Service | ||
September 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 06, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT(S) E-H |
||
September 06, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT(S) M-O |
||
September 06, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION-BEFORE CONVERSION |
||
September 06, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT(S) P-T |
||
September 06, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT(S) A-D |
||
September 06, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.