Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chin Chung Lu, Li Hua Lu, Lu Holding Llc, Wen Mei Lu, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Crain, Jon Eric, Freund, Marc E, against Wen Fu Lu, Wen Ying Gamba, Yuen Hsiang Lu, represented by Brennan, Timothy Scott, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with James E Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Constructive Trust) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeTrusts |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 01, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 18, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 03, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 03, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 31, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 03, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: August 20, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 20, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: August 03, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 05, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 12, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #21)
Date: November 13, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 16, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 20, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 20, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #19)
Date: December 08, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 01, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #20)
Date: December 08, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #18)
Date: December 08, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 04, 2020JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: July 07, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED) Â (Motion #21)
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 07, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 21, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 09, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #21)
Date: May 06, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: December 22, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 12, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 12, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 03, 2021SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 04, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 04, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 29, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 28, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 30, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 04, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: May 25, 2021ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: May 27, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 11, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 17, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 03, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: June 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 24, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 25, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 10, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 09, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: May 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 06, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 14, 2021JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #29)
Date: July 30, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 14, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: July 07, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: September 03, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 14, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: August 06, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: June 18, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 11, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: June 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 03, 2020CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: August 11, 2020NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: July 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 03, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #19)
Date: August 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #24)
Date: February 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #19)
Date: September 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #23) Correspondence on Insurance Issue
Date: November 20, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 20, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 24, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 12, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #26)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #24)
Date: February 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #28)
Date: May 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #28)
Date: May 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #27)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #18)
Date: August 24, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: May 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #28)
Date: May 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #20)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 22, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #24)
Date: February 12, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 29, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #21)
Date: October 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 02, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 09, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 16, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #26)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #24)
Date: February 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #21)
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #27)
Date: May 28, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: June 05, 2021ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #26)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #29)
Date: July 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #27)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #26)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #27)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #26)
Date: May 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #26)
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #27)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #27)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #27)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #27)
Date: May 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #28)
Date: May 29, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #29)
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #29)
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #29)
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #29)
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #29)
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #32)
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - HH Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - FF Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - GG Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - II Â (Motion #30)
Date: September 03, 2021MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #31)
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #31)
Date: October 08, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #31)
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #32)
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 19, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: October 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #31)
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #31)
Date: October 08, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 18, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: October 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #30)
Date: October 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #30)
Date: October 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #32)
Date: February 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #30)
Date: November 03, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #30)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #30)
Date: November 03, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #32)
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #32)
Date: February 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #32)
Date: February 11, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 11, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: October 01, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: October 20, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: October 22, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 19, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: May 20, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 04, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 19, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 08, 2021ORDER - OTHER Â - motion 23
Date: November 04, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 10, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #23)
Date: December 10, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #23)
Date: November 06, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #23)
Date: December 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 10, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
June 07, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 07, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
February 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #32) Order of Judge Nolan appointing receiver |
||
February 11, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
February 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #32) Invoices |
||
February 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #32) Monthly statement from ATCo |
||
February 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #32) Checkbook register |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.