Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J. Chauvin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J. Chauvin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management50 days |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2018 |
||
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2020 |
||
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
||
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CROWELL (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. ANN C. CROWELL |
|
September 22, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CROWELL (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. ANN C. CROWELL |
|
August 21, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CROWELL (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. ANN C. CROWELL |
|
May 07, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CROWELL (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. ANN C. CROWELL |
|
April 06, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE CROWELL (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. ANN C. CROWELL |
|
October 25, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE CROWELL (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. ANN C. CROWELL |
|
September 27, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE CROWELL (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. ANN C. CROWELL |
|
August 01, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE CROWELL (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. ANN C. CROWELL |
|
July 01, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE CROWELL (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. ANN C. CROWELL |
|
June 20, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE CROWELL (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. ANN C. CROWELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.