Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Raymond Debras, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Epstein, Reuven J, against J.P. Morgan Chase, Lois A. Barlotta, Richard C. Barlotta, represented by Magliano, William Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 31, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 31, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 | Hearing |
9:30am ptc virtual
Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Expert Witness |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | |
July 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Held 11:10am PC virtual Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Conference Confirmation |
|
July 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Honorable JSC Robert M. Berliner |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JP Morgan Chase |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Lois A. Barlotta |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.