Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Umb Bank -Tr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by May, Ted E, against Arnold Garelick, Caner Privatstiftung, Choice Productions, Craig Applebaum Dba, Crystal Clear Pools, (total of 28) See All represented by Berger, Ricki Hollis, Gura, John E., Mcdonough, Michael A, Ugell, Scott B, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with _ Fsp-R presiding.
Case Number |
Judge_ Fsp-R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 29, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 05, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 | Hearing |
Judge: Part (Rockland), Foreclosure Set |
|
September 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued
Judge: Part (Rockland), Foreclosure Set |
|
August 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Part (Rockland), Foreclosure Set |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
May 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Part (Rockland), Foreclosure Set |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.